Financial history FRIENDS OF EARLSWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1086791
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013
Total gross income £8.33k £9.14k £7.60k £6.13k £12.15k
Total expenditure £4.85k £11.07k £6.67k £11.19k £12.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A