Accounts and annual returns HORSHAM VOLUNTEER BUREAU

Charity number: 1087258
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 02 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 02 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 30 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 26 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 26 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 11 November 2005 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 11 November 2005 11 days late