Financial history WORLD RESTORATION MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1088882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £273.12k £150.72k £187.61k £319.00k £331.96k
Total expenditure £261.76k £165.87k £198.19k £314.02k £338.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.09k N/A £9.96k