Accounts and annual returns PIONEER TRAINING

Charity number: 1088926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 28 November 2007 On Time