Financial history SILVERTON SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1087605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.94k £1.52k £1.70k £6.58k £5.13k
Total expenditure £4.06k £1.72k £1.12k £5.49k £2.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A