Accounts and annual returns RAINBOW DEVELOPMENT IN AFRICA

Charity number: 1087744
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 July 2021 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 March 2021 411 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 05 July 2021 516 days late