Accounts and annual returns COOMBE HILL INFANTS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1087288
Charity reporting is up to date (124 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 November 2024 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 November 2024 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 October 2024 483 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 October 2024 483 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 July 2024 739 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 July 2024 739 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 May 2021 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 May 2021 330 days late Download Open in new window