Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ABBEYFIELDS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1087004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 October 2022 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 October 2021 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required