Accounts and annual returns WESLEY COMMUNITY FURNITURE PROJECT

Charity number: 1088680
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 24 November 2008 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 November 2008 302 days late
Annual return 30 September 2006 27 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 30 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2005 03 August 2006 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 03 August 2006 4 days late