Accounts and annual returns KING'S CENTRE (SHEFFIELD) TRUST

Charity number: 1088932
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 11 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 28 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 06 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 16 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 16 February 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 14 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 14 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 23 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 23 October 2006 On Time