Financial history CHEVELEY EVERGREEN CLUB

Charity Number: 1087261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/03/2020 26/03/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £0 £692 £1.36k £1.99k
Total expenditure £2.33k £0 £1.05k £1.68k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A