Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF CLIFTON PARK MUSEUM

Charity number: 1088580
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 488 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 853 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 853 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 March 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 March 2022 449 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required