Accounts and annual returns KING GEORGE'S FIELD CHASE PARK, WHICKHAM

Charity number: 1087293
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 18 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 10 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 01 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required