Financial history G R WATERS CHARITABLE TRUST 2000

Charity Number: 1091525
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £88.38k £65.80k £72.73k £53.75k £29.91k
Total expenditure £210.38k £422.14k £186.01k £38.43k £702.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A