Accounts and annual returns DEVON AND CORNWALL REFUGEE SUPPORT COUNCIL DCRSC

Charity number: 1092992
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 28 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 01 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 24 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 24 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 29 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 29 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 20 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 20 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 09 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 09 October 2006 On Time