Accounts and annual returns HAVERING ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS LIMITED HAVCO)

Charity Number: 1088267
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 28 October 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 26 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 10 October 2014 On Time