Accounts and annual returns THE BOOMERANG CLUB

Charity number: 1088065
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 29 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 10 July 2006 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 24 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required