Accounts and annual returns RUUNKI DEVELOPMENT INITIATIVES (RUUDI)

Charity number: 1091411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 February 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required