Accounts and annual returns WHITEHILL INFANT SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1089162
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 03 May 2018 672 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required