Financial history LORD WILLIAMS'S SCHOOL DAY NURSERY

Charity number: 1089101
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £303.07k £283.77k £326.21k £305.51k £360.14k
Total expenditure £298.78k £276.90k £312.56k £348.21k £361.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.48k £1.85k N/A N/A