Financial history Encephalitis International

Charity Number: 1087843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.16m £996.91k £957.25k £954.19k £1.06m
Total expenditure £809.58k £719.08k £880.30k £1.07m £1.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £965 N/A £1.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £493.16k £313.72k £343.14k £290.14k £372.33k
Income - Other trading activities £331.05k £278.94k £275.38k £308.99k £315.66k
Income - Charitable activities £324.65k £388.17k £321.50k £328.96k £341.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.13k £16.08k £17.24k £26.10k £32.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £7.00k £8.25k £5.00k £56.73k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £689.90k £575.78k £674.01k £879.32k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £119.68k £143.30k £206.29k £191.08k £214.55k
Expenditure - Governance £60.56k £43.77k £35.85k £46.39k £49.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £51.93k £41.07k £22.80k £33.75k £61.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £2.72k £4.84k £5.56k £4.98k £5.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0