Financial history EBRINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1090225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.79k £11.95k £2.79k £18.98k £12.90k
Total expenditure £11.85k £7.41k £8.63k £18.19k £11.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.20k N/A £800 £200