Financial history THE PLYMOUTH NAVAL BASE MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1088673
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2010 28/02/2011 28/02/2012 28/02/2013 28/02/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A