Accounts and annual returns RHYMNEY VALLEY MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1089092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 12 April 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 March 2022 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required