Accounts and annual returns ETERNAL LIFE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1096496
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 February 2025 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 October 2023 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 April 2022 429 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required