Accounts and annual returns SENEGAMBIA DAIRATUL MAHABBA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 12 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 June 2024 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 18 June 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 02 June 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 May 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required