Financial history FRIENDS OF SUGAR MILL PONDS

Charity Number: 1092045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.79k £16.69k £5.20k £7.47k £9.70k
Total expenditure £7.57k £3.79k £5.50k £14.53k £6.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A