Financial history SOAPBOX COMMUNICATIONS TRUST

Charity number: 1088937
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £308.96k £285.80k £275.28k £265.03k £217.94k
Total expenditure £330.18k £337.86k £314.60k £276.02k £294.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A