Accounts and annual returns THE GRACE, SHUA AND JACOB BALLAS (ENGLISH) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1091592
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 26 February 2009 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 April 2009 88 days late