Trustees TIFFIN GIRLS MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1090557

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adeniyi Odumboni | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faith Yovan | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Hang Shu | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Gueorgieva | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carmen Eneida Lozano Rios | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lyall | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lopamudra Saha-Deftereos | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor TOBY WISEMAN | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Kate McClure | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Owen | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Narissa Bowles | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Foster | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.