Accounts and annual returns WISBECH AND DISTRICT CANCER SUPPORT

Charity number: 1091614
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 28 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 24 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 18 June 2013 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 16 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 23 January 2012 On Time