Governing document HERTS PEOPLE FIRST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2013 as amended on 28 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES LIVING OR WORKING IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS THROUGH SERVICES WHICH ENABLE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, PROFESSIONALS, CARERS AND THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES SO PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES MAY ACHIEVE FULL PARTICIPATION IN THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.