Financial history THE EDWARD AND IVY ROSE HOOD MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1089372
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £11.05k £12.75k £15.05k £15.83k £17.70k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £34.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0