Financial history KABER VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1089964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.82k £10.30k £17.94k £3.62k £1.37k
Total expenditure £842 £1.41k £937 £1.87k £6.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A