Accounts and annual returns THE HAVEBURY HOUSING PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1092077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On Time