Governing document MANSFIELD BOWLING CLUB
Charity number: 1091055
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 12 NOVEMBER 1923 AS REVISED 5 MAY 1952, 7 APRIL 1982, 10 APRIL 1985, 8 APRIL 1987, 20 AUGUST 2001 AND 13 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A BOWLS CLUB IN MANSFIELD, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CLUB IS PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF THE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MANSFIELD, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.