Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF UYO, AKWA IBOM STATE, NIGERIA

Charity Number: 1090561
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 29 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 07 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 05 July 2007 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 12 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 05 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required