Accounts and annual returns TECHNICAL RESCUE UNIT

Charity number: 1091313
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 31 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 14 November 2011 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 14 November 2010 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 29 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required