Financial history Sustainable Food Somerset Ltd

Charity Number: 1107311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £188 £20.00k £525 £0
Total expenditure £5.69k £7.67k £12.50k £8.81k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.00k N/A N/A