Financial history FRIENDS OF BETLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.66k £2.81k £18.06k £9.70k £12.37k
Total expenditure £8.89k £7.01k £12.66k £12.23k £11.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A