Accounts and annual returns GABILEY AREA RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION (GARDO)

Charity number: 1092597
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 March 2023 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required