Accounts and annual returns HIGH OAKHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1090649

Charity reporting is overdue by 1682 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 221 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 221 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 587 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 587 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 952 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 952 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1317 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1317 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1682 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1682 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window