Financial history BIRDING FOR ALL

Charity Number: 1091755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.09k £2.01k £637 £231 £220
Total expenditure £3.53k £213 £249 £1.10k £95
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A