Accounts and annual returns THE ELGAR IN HEREFORD GROUP

Charity Number: 1100709
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 20 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 26 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 28 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2009 12 August 2010 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required