Financial history GRACE EVANGELICAL CHURCH ENDOWED CHARITY

Charity number: 1091237
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6 £1.20k £901 £835 £0
Total expenditure £1.40k £1.30k £1.23k £448 £288
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A