Financial history CENTRAL SURGERY PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP

Charity number: 1092592
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009
Total gross income £997 £967 £362 £362 £588
Total expenditure £1.12k £523 £375 £375 £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A