Financial history GRANGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1091306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.04k £12.82k £19.26k £13.21k £16.20k
Total expenditure £5.48k £9.14k £16.33k £13.09k £9.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A