Accounts and annual returns THE COSSINGTON CONCERT TRUST

Charity Number: 1092995
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 25 October 2018 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required