Financial history THE FRIENDS OF EWYAS HAROLD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1090492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.31k £6.49k £3.48k £5.46k £3.36k
Total expenditure £8.12k £4.56k £17.27k £4.53k £835
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A