Financial history TEAMGATE LANGUAGE AND MULTICULTURAL LEARNING AND EDUCATION CENTRES

Charity Number: 1092464
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £14.27k £7.40k £2.23k £139 £2.60k
Total expenditure £29.16k £7.40k £2.14k £0 £2.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A